+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 227 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0227)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1293ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (7-Y 5-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (87-Y 11-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1293E
- Printed as engrossed 18102517D-E
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (19-Y 2-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102517D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor