+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (54)
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Colgan, Cross, Chichester
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Delegates: Cranwell, Jackson, Miller
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (37-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 91-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (5-Y 91-N)
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 3- N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD7207605 (HB1293S1)
- Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Amendments by Del. Scott agreed to
- VOTE: ADOPTION (55-Y 44-N)
- Amendment by Del. Jackson agreed to (55-Y 44-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Amendments by Del. Marshall rejected
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Amendments by Del. Parrish agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- VOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 47-N)
- Amendments by Del. Van Landingham rejected (47-Y 47-N)
- Read third time and passed House (82-Y 17-N)
- Amendments by Del. Van Landingham reconsidered
- Amendments by Del. Marshall rejected
- Printed as engrossed LD7179168 (HB1293EH1)
- Communicated to Senate
- Amendments by Del. Van Landingham rejected (38-Y 56-N)
- Engrossed by House-committee substitute/with amds.
- VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N)
- Motion to lay amendment on table rejected
- Amendments by Del. Mims agreed to
- VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (35-Y 60-N)
- Motion to rec. Del. Van Landingham amd. rej. (35-Y 60-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED #2 (38-Y 56-N)
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD7179168 (HB1293H1)
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (14-Y 8-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
March 2, 1994: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (37-Y 0-N)
February 28, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 91-N)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
February 23, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1994: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (55-Y 44-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 47-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED #2 (38-Y 56-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (35-Y 60-N)
February 12, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (14-Y 8-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor