+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 14, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
On April 9, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 588 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 31, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1291ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Amendment by Del. Tata agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Printed as engrossed LD7177168 (HB1291EH1)
- Engrossed by House-committee substitute/with amd.
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (16-Y 6-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD7177168 (HB1291H1)
On January 26, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
February 12, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (16-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor