+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0626)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 626 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1290ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N)
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 7-N)
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1290H1
- Substitute by Delegate Hayes agreed to 22106070D-H1
- Passed by temporarily
- Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation amendment rejected
- Read second time
- Floor substitute printed 22106070D-H1 (Hayes)
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendment(s) (19-Y 2-N)
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
- Presented and ordered printed 22103585D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2022: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2022: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2022: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor