+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 18, 2006 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
- VOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 52-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation (47-Y 52-N)
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1290ER)
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (83-Y 17-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 17-N)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Motion to reconsidered pass by for the day agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (35-Y 4-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (35-Y 4-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1290S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 069236496-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 069236496-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 069211496-H1
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1290H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1290H1
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 069211496-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: #1 (Orrock)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 062625496
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 52-N)
March 2, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 17-N)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: (35-Y 4-N)
February 23, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2006: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
February 9, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2006: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor