+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (9-Y 5-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 2-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 6-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104038D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1287H1
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Incorporates HB1468
- Committee substitute printed 15104038D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On September 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100438D
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2015: Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (9-Y 5-N)
February 11, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 2-N)
February 3, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
January 28, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
January 21, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor