+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0295)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 295 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1285ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 20100224D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1285E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100224D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2020: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Tony O. Wilt
Type:
Primary Sponsor