+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 1, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1022)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 1022 (effective 7/1/96)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 10, 1996 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 27, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 21, 1996 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1284ER)
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 960709350-S1
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub.960709350-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 2-N)
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 960709350-S1
- Reported from Transportation w/sub. (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 967965350-H1
- Read second time
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 967965350-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 967965350-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub. (19-Y 3-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 960286350
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 17, 1996: VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
April 17, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 2-N)
March 1, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: Reported from Transportation w/sub. (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N)
February 8, 1996: Reported from Tra. w/sub. (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor