+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 31, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 522 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1284ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (28-Y 9-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 4-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rehab sub: Social Service and Corrections
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (78-Y 22-N)
- VOTE: Passage (78-Y 22-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 20107884D-H2
- Committee on Public Safety substitute rejected 20107325D-H1
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1284H2
On February 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20107884D-H2
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Public Safety with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
- Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 20107325D-H1
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PS sub: Public Safety
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102493D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
February 28, 2020: Passed Senate (28-Y 9-N)
February 27, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2020: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 4-N)
February 11, 2020: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 22-N)
February 7, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2020: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
January 30, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Patrick A. Hope
Type:
Primary Sponsor