+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 10 (effective 7/1/10)
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1283ER)
- Enrolled
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N)
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N)
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 10104131D
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2010: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
January 27, 2010: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor