+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0801)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 801 (effective 7/1/12)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1280ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (33-Y 2-N)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (92-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1280ER)
- Enrolled
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Conference report agreed to by House (88-Y 1-N 1-A)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senators: Stuart, Vogel, Obenshain
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Stolle, Minchew, Lewis
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 94-N)
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 12, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #5 Mental Health
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 12104506D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (12)
April 18, 2012: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (33-Y 2-N)
April 18, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2012: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 1-N 1-A)
March 6, 2012: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2012: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N)
February 29, 2012: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor