+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Rehabilitation and Social Services (7-Y 7-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 40-N)
- Read third time and passed House (59-Y 40-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 18102167D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1280E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 8-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (15-Y 6-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102167D
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2018: Failed to report (defeated) in Rehabilitation and Social Services (7-Y 7-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 40-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 8-N)
February 6, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
January 30, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor