+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 752 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1280ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1280H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106422D-H1
- Read second time
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20106422D-H1
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102480D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2020: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2020: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2020: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Israel D. O'Quinn
Type:
Primary Sponsor