+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Delegates: Davis, Coyner, Hayes
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Senators: Locke, Hashmi, Lucas
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 98-N)
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N)
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB128H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105480D-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 22105480D-H1
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 7, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101874D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (11)
March 10, 2022: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2022: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N)
March 8, 2022: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2022: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2022: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N)
January 31, 2022: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2022: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor