+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 4, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0136)
On March 30, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 136 (effective 3/30/94)
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB128ER)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Trans / Special Grants
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Claims (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Claims
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause