+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103773D
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Votes (2)
January 24, 2018: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
January 22, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor