+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in General Laws (13-Y 2-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 30-N 8-A)
- Passed House (59-Y 30-N)
- VOTE: (47-Y 49-N 2-A)
- Motion to refer to C.J. committee rejected(47-Y 49-N 2-A)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Pending question ordered
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 006276946-H1
- Amendment by Del. Diamonstein agreed to (70-Y 25-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (70-Y 25-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 22-N 1-A)
- Amendment by Del. Jackson agreed to (72-Y 22-N)
- Motion to refer to P. & E. rejected (17-Y 75-N)
- VOTE: (17-Y 75-N 4-A)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amds. 006276946-EH1
- Printed as engrossed 006276946-EH1
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 006276946-H1
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 006852968