+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (56)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720)
- Enacted, Chapter 720 (effective 7/1/15)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1275ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed 15105776D-H2
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1275ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N)
- Conference substitute printed 15105470D-H1
- Amended by conference committee
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Delegates: Cox, Jones, Joannou
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators: Barker, Watkins, Stosch
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 15104957D-S1 (1-Y 98-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1275S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104957D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15104957D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 15100099D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1275E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
On July 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100099D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
April 15, 2015: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2015: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2015: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N)
February 13, 2015: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2015: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2015: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (109)
Type:
Primary Sponsor