+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0204)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 204 (effective 7/1/16)
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/16
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1275ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1275H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105092D-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 16105092D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 16104050D
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2016: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor