+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N)
- Read third time and passed House (64-Y 34-N)
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 064746348-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1274E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (14-Y 8-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 064746348
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2006: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
February 10, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor