+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House sustained Governor's veto
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1270ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (51-Y 47-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 10-N)
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103053D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2018: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
February 28, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N)
February 7, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N)
January 30, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 10-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor