+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 14, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB127ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recom. (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 811 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 31, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB127ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 987332254-E
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (25-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Claims with amendments (12-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Claims sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 987332254
- Referred to Committee on Claims