+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 2, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
On March 27, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 511 (effective-see bill)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1268ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate amd agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Ed.
On January 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N)
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 989530178-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Mrs. Crittenden agreed to
- Committee amendment rejected
- Read second time
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 20, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 18, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 15, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 14, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On December 22, 1998 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 989530178
On November 23, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amd. (25-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Appropriations (28-Y 2-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education with amendment (23-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 989530178
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (10)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1999: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N 1-A)
November 23, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with amd. (25-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Appropriations (28-Y 2-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Education with amendment (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor