+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0793)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 793 (effective 7/1/14)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1268ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
- Governor's substitute printed 14105796D-H2
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1268ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105210D-S1 (99-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1268S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105210D-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 14105210D-S1
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1268H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104573D-H1
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104573D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed 14104193D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
April 23, 2014: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 23, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2014: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2014: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2014: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor