+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 5, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170)
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 170 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 11, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1266ER)
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD0537687 (HB1266E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Emergency clause deleted
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 1994: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1994: Reported from General Laws with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1994: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor