+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0277)
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 277 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 21, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1266ER)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 060020348
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2006: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor