+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws and Technology (6-Y 9-N)
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 14104185D
+ − Votes (4)
February 10, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2014: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor