+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- No further action taken
- Failed to pass
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators: DeSteph, Black, Ebbin
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Delegates: Toscano, Peace, Garrett
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 96-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104633D