+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 603 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1261ER)
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (93-Y 6-N)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 2-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 1-N)
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 4-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1261H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104434D-H1
- Read second time
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104434D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (12-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 14104183D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 6, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N)
March 5, 2014: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 2-N)
March 4, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2014: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 1-N)
February 10, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
February 4, 2014: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor