+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0330)
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 330 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1260ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Care
On January 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2008 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 088535664-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1260E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088535664
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 2008: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2008: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor