+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 71 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0071)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1260ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1260E
- Printed as engrossed 18102345D-E
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102345D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice