+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0072)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 72 (effective 7/1/12)
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB126ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 12105401D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB126S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105401D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 12105401D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 12100215D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB126E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N)
On January 13, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 4, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100215D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 17, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2012: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor