+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 4-N)
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
- Passed by temporarily
- Floor substitute printed 22106572D-H1 (Webert)
- Substitute by Delegate Webert agreed to 22106572D-H1
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1259H1
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
- Presented and ordered printed 22104375D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 15, 2022: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N)
February 8, 2022: Reported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 1-N)
February 3, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor