+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 835 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0835)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1258ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (35-Y 0-N 4-A)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (87-Y 9-N 2-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 9-N 2-A)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB1258ER)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1258ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107802D-S2 (51-Y 46-N 2-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 46-N 2-A)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute rejected 18107477D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 18107802D-S2 (McDougle)
- Substitute by Senator McDougle agreed to 18107802D-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1258S2
- Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 15-N 4-A)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Committee substitute printed 18107477D-S1
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (56-Y 41-N 2-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 41-N 2-A)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106428D-H1
- Amendment by Delegate Ware agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1258EH1
- Printed as engrossed 18106428D-EH1
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 2-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106428D-H1
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102258D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
+ − Votes (10)
April 18, 2018: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (35-Y 0-N 4-A)
April 18, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 9-N 2-A)
April 18, 2018: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 5, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 46-N 2-A)
March 1, 2018: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 15-N 4-A)
February 28, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 9, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 41-N 2-A)
February 1, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor