+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 2, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0304)
On April 1, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 304 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 12, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1258ER)
On February 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 9, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 022818732-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 022818732-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 022818732-H1
- Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to A., C. & N. R. sub-committee: 2
On January 17, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 022193732