+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 29, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0179)
On March 24, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 179 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1256ER)
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 3-N)
On February 22, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (25-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 004833648
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N)
February 21, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2000: Reported from Transportation w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2000: Reported from Tra. (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor