+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 19, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0472)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 472 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 19, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1254ER)
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1254H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 048706336-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 048706336-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 1
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 049819336
+ − Votes (7)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2004: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2004: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor