+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 9, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 315 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1250ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 4-N)
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1250H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104956D-H1
- Read second time
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104956D-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (18-Y 1-N)
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #2
On January 18, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 10103138D
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2010: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N)
February 8, 2010: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (18-Y 1-N)
February 4, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor