+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 7, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
On April 5, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 357 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1249ER)
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Read first time
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed