+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 751 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1249ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (79-Y 21-N)
- Read third time and passed House (79-Y 21-N)
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1249H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107393D-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102086D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2020: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
March 2, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2020: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 7, 2020: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 21-N)
February 4, 2020: Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
January 30, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Luke E. Torian
Type:
Primary Sponsor