+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (53)
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 543 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1249ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 8-N 1-A)
- Conference report agreed to by House (88-Y 8-N 1-A)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (28-Y 11-N)
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (32-Y 7-N)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators: Obenshain, Howell, Stanley
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Delegates: Toscano, Bell, Robert B., Collins
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 97-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Passed Senate with amendment (31-Y 8-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (32-Y 8-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 2-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 7-N 1-A)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1249E
- Printed as engrossed 18102222D-E
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102222D
+ − Votes (17)
March 8, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 8-N 1-A)
March 7, 2018: Conference report agreed to by Senate (32-Y 7-N)
March 7, 2018: Conference report agreed to by Senate (28-Y 11-N)
February 27, 2018: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N)
February 21, 2018: Passed Senate with amendment (31-Y 8-N 1-A)
February 21, 2018: Passed Senate with amendment (32-Y 8-N)
February 21, 2018: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 2-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N 1-A)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor