+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Commerce and Labor
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Rereferred to Commerce and Labor
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18105444D-H1
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102020D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
+ − Votes (2)
February 8, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
February 6, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor