+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0873)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 873 (effective 7/1/06)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1248ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1248ER)
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 5-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (93-Y 5-N)
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 068299332-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1248S1
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 068299332-S1
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 068270332-EH1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1248EH1
- Amendment by Delegate Lingamfelter withdrawn
- Amendment by Delegate McQuigg agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 068270332-H1
- Read second time
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 068270332-H1
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation sub-committee: #1 (Welch)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 068726332
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
March 9, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 5-N)
March 7, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2006: VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2006: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 7, 2006: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor