+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 7, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
On April 4, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 297 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1246ER)
On February 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1994: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1994: Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor