+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0243)
On March 16, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 243 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 29, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1246ER)
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 960659432-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 960659432-H1
- Read second time
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 960659432-H1
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed 962381432
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1996: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1996: Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor