+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103779D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
+ − Votes (3)
February 8, 2018: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor