+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 549 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1245ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Committee amendment rejected
- Read second time
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 12104121D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 2012: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2012: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2012: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor