+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (18-Y 4-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 14104164D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2014: Reported from Transportation with amendment (18-Y 4-N)
January 30, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor