+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On April 27, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0949)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 949 (effective-see bill)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 11, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1243ER)
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 2-N)
- Senate sub. w/amds. agreed to by House (91-Y 2-N)
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amds. (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate-comm. substitute w/amds.
- Read third time
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Sen. Earley agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD3472312 (HB1243S1)
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (13-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (20-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD3433312 (HB1243H1)
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 2-N)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (13-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
February 12, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (20-Y 1-N)
February 11, 1994: Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor