+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0633)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 633 (effective 4/5/12)
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1243ER)
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned Local Gov sub: Charter
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 12101961D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 6, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (100-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2012: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2012: Reported from Local Government with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2012: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor